MD SB782 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 to make the sole grantee for specified grants for the Woodlawn Barn Visitor's Center, the Maryland National Capital Park and Planning Commission; altering the requirement to provide a certain matching fund; providing that specified grants may not terminate before December 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Montgomery County - Woodlawn Barn Visitor's Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |