MD SB772 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration to compensate employees of the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital Center who are required to attend a correctional training school at a pay rate equivalent to similar employees in the Division of Correction; authorizing the Director to develop a plan to carry out a pay rate increase for specified employees of the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital Center; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to review all positions filled by specified State employees; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Employees - Job Titles, Position Descriptions, and Compensation Levels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {837871/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Correction, Division of
Courts
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Hospitals
Correction, Division of
Courts
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Hospitals