MD SB77 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the application of the Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program to civil court proceedings.
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-10-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Civil Actions
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Dogs
Harford County
Minors
Sunset
Witnesses
Civil Actions
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Dogs
Harford County
Minors
Sunset
Witnesses