MD SB769 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 966
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain requirements for the amount and duration of a tax credit against the property tax imposed on certain improved real property owned by the Emmitsburg Civic Association and located in a historic district in Frederick County; authorizing the governing body of Frederick County to provide, by law, for the amount and duration of the credit and certain other matters relating to the credit; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024.
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax Credit for Property Located in Historic District - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 966 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB740 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Frederick County
Historical Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Historical Matters
Laws and Ordinances
Property Tax
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |