MD SB761 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an addition modification for certain distributions made under certain college investment accounts that are used for certain elementary and secondary education expenses; requiring certain account holders to report to the Comptroller in a certain manner whether certain distributions were used for certain education expenses; excluding from a subtraction modification certain contributions to and distributions from a certain college investment plan that is used for certain elementary and secondary education expenses; etc.
Title
Income Tax - 529 College Investment Plans - Elementary and Secondary Education Expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1066 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Comptroller
Education
Exemptions
Forms
Higher Education
Income Tax
Investments
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Education
Exemptions
Forms
Higher Education
Income Tax
Investments
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0761?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0761f.pdf |