MD SB760 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified procedures for suspending or dismissing specified public school personnel; authorizing specified public school personnel to request arbitration under specified circumstances; specifying the procedures for arbitration; assigning responsibility to the individual for 25% of the cost and expenses of the arbitration and 75% to the county board; and providing that an arbitrator's award is final and binding on the parties, subject to review by a circuit court.
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Adopted (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Adopted (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 Report Adopted (32-14) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864532/1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Arbitration
Circuit Courts
Counties
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Judicial Review
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Teachers
Circuit Courts
Counties
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Hearings
Judicial Review
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Teachers