MD SB751 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain appointing authorities from delegating the authority to make the final decision on the appointment or termination of certain employees; requiring the Appointments Office, by December 31, 2019, and each December 31 thereafter, to submit a report to the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight on the Office's activities regarding employees under the jurisdiction of an appointing authority; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to provide a certain hotline or e-mail address for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-32) (Y: 105 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-25) (Y: 17 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (26-17) (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (105-32)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-01HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (26-17)
2019-03-29SenateMotion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-25)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {687678/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateLaid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {687678/1
2019-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback