MD SB75 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the placement and use of speed monitoring systems on Patuxent Road through Historic Woodwardville in Anne Arundel County, subject to certain placement and signage requirements; and requiring that the fines collected by Anne Arundel County as a result of violations enforced by certain speed monitoring systems be used to assist in covering the cost of speed reduction measures and roadway and pedestrian safety improvements on Patuxent Road through Historic Woodwardville.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Patuxent Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Boundaries
Courts
Electronic Surveillance
Fines
Highways
Revenue and Taxes
Signs and Billboards
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Boundaries
Courts
Electronic Surveillance
Fines
Highways
Revenue and Taxes
Signs and Billboards
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |