MD SB748 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that it is lawful under certain provisions of law for an employee or agent of a financial institution to intercept and record a certain oral communication under certain circumstances; providing that an audio recording shall be preserved for at least 30 calendar days; requiring a financial institution to adopt an audio recordings retention policy; providing that a certain audio recording may be made available by an institution to a law enforcement officer, a State's Attorney or an agent of the Federal Bureau of Investigation; etc.
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Wayne Norman [R] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387873/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Communications
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Notices
Recordings
Records
State's Attorneys
Time
Communications
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Notices
Recordings
Records
State's Attorneys
Time