MD SB743 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-12 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the manner in which certain trustees are chosen to serve on the board of the Maryland Environmental Trust by requiring certain ex officio members of the Trust to appoint the remaining trustees.
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Environmental Trust - Appointment of Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB992 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 3 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |