MD SB742 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that specified provisions of law granting a person who is issued special registration plates for individuals with disabilities the authority to park for unlimited periods of time in specified restricted parking zones do not supersede local ordinances in Baltimore City that restrict parking for vehicles that do not display specified residential parking permits.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Special Order until 4/8 (Delegate Malone) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Malone) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties - Local Laws
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
License Plates
Licenses
Parking
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Counties - Local Laws
Disabilities
Laws and Ordinances
License Plates
Licenses
Parking
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration