MD SB741 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a trustee to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to represent the interests of county governments; establishing the qualifications of the trustee; and requiring that the Governor appoint the trustee, who may be from a list submitted by the Maryland Association of Counties.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-4) (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-4) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {799039/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 8:30 a.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |