MD SB735 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the availability of remote notarial acts to include certain will and trust documents; clarifying the application of certain provisions of law regarding identity proofing and credential analysis; establishing certain procedures for certain remote notarial acts; and affirming the validity of the notarization of certain documents in conformance with certain executive orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Notarial Acts - Remote Notarizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-20HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {528273/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-09SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-05SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1265 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government18214(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government18214.1(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government18222(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government18223(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback