MD SB732 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy to the Department of Disabilities; requiring the Department to provide staff for the Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs; and altering the membership of the Maryland Commission on Disabilities to add one individual with a traumatic brain injury.
Title
Department of Disabilities - State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Maryland Commission on Disabilities - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103926/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {973229/1 Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 7 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |