MD SB732 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "practice athletic training"; repealing certain provisions of law requiring an athletic trainer to practice in a certain setting; altering the information that is required to be included in an evaluation and treatment protocol; authorizing an athletic trainer to provide treatment for not more than 14 days to a certain athletic individual unless the trainer has received a referral from a certain health care provider; providing that preventive care is not considered treatment for a certain purpose; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {613426/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Lam) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {884933/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB576 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Education
Emergencies
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Public Schools
Records
Sports and Recreation
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Education
Emergencies
Examinations
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Public Schools
Records
Sports and Recreation
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 14 | 5D-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5D-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5D-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5D-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5D-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5D-11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |