MD SB731 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Rent Stabilization Program for Seniors in the Department of Housing and Community Development; restricting the amount of rent landlords may charge specified senior tenants; providing for adjustment of the rent ceiling; authorizing a specified tax credit; requiring a specified registration statement; establishing specified petition procedures; imposing specified penalties; providing for a specified exemption due to financial hardship and for specified establishments; etc.
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Rent Stabilization Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing cancelled (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. (Education Health and Environmental Affairs) | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appeals
Counties
Elderly Persons
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
Judicial Review
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Property Tax
Public Information
Records
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Counties
Elderly Persons
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Inspections
Judicial Review
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Property Tax
Public Information
Records
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0731.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0731f.pdf |