MD SB730 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021, a person from selling or offering for sale coal tar pavement products or from applying coal tar pavement products to a pavement or a similar surface; and establishing a civil penalty not to exceed $500 for a first offense and not exceeding $1,000 for a second or subsequent offense for certain violations.
Title
Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB553 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 2301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0730?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0730f.pdf |