MD HB553 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2021, a person from selling or offering for sale coal tar pavement products or from applying coal tar pavement products to a pavement or a similar surface; and establishing a civil penalty not to exceed $500 for a first offense and not exceeding $1,000 for a second or subsequent offense for certain violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-30HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-28HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB730 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment92301(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92302(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment92303(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback