MD SB73 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law so as to require the Governor to appoint directly the Director of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA); and requiring the Director of MEMA to be responsible to the Governor for carrying out the State emergency management program, to develop specified mutual aid agreements without specified approval, and to employ personnel in a specified manner that is not subject to a specified authority.
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Director
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-01-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-01-18 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/14 at 2:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-10-01 | Pre-filed |