MD SB723 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to adopt regulations for the privacy and security of protected health information obtained or released through a health information exchange by specified persons; requiring the regulations to include protections for the secondary use of specified information; providing that the regulations do not apply to protected health information exchanged between and among specified persons; etc.
Title
Medical Records - Health Information Exchanges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Computers
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Liability
Patients
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations
Computers
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Liability
Patients
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Rules and Regulations