MD SB722 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the mandatory retirement age for the Director of the State Department of Assessments and Taxation and the supervisor of assessments for a county.
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Mandatory Retirement Age – Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Age
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Public Officials
Retirement
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Public Officials
Retirement
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 2 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |