MD SB72 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified buses from provisions of law establishing tanden axle weight limits; clarifying that specified vehicle weight limits apply to specified buses; and increasing to 550 pounds the weight limit tolerance for the use of specified equipment that promotes fuel economy and reduced emissions.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {848975/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-09-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Buses
Energy Matters
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Energy Matters
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures