MD SB714 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain providers of a 9-1-1-accessible service provide notice to certain entities in the event of a certain service outage lasting more than 30 minutes and affecting more than 600,000 user minutes; altering responsibilities and standards of the Maryland 9-1-1 Board to include support for certain 9-1-1 specialist recruitment activities; altering the purposes of the 9-1-1 Trust Fund to include funding for 9-1-1 specialist recruitment activities; prohibiting the Fund from being used for a certain purpose; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2021-04-02HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {727371/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-02-10SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB989 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety1301(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1304.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1305(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1306(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1308(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1309(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1312(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1314(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback