MD HB989 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain providers of a 9-1-1-accessible service provide certain notice to a certain public safety answering point, the Maryland Joint Operations Center, and the Maryland 9-1-1 Board in the event of a 9-1-1-accessible service outage lasting more than 30 minutes and affecting more than 600,000 user minutes; requiring the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to report to the General Assembly certain demographic, employment, and training information regarding 9-1-1 specialists by December 31, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-04-06HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-31SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments {207878/1 Adopted
2021-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2021-03-22SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2021-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {976586/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-12HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB714 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety1301(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1304.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1305(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1306(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1308(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1309(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1312(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1314(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback