MD SB712 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the department charged with oversight of a State-owned nursing home operated by a contractor, instead of the contractor, to provide notice of certain deficiencies and enforcement actions to the Governor, certain members of the General Assembly, and the local governing body of the county in which the nursing home is located; and requiring the department charged with oversight to provide certain information within 30 days after the contractor's final acceptance of a plan of correction or completion of an informal dispute resolution.
Title
State-Owned Nursing Homes - Deficiencies, Citations, and Fines - Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 860 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {703329/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB938 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 861
Subjects
Citations
Counties
Disclosure
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Labor, Department of
Notices
Nursing Homes
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Counties
Disclosure
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Labor, Department of
Notices
Nursing Homes
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
studies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 14C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 14C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |