MD SB712 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services using a certain commercial motor vehicle in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; establishing certain requirements and procedures for the registration of household goods movers under the Act; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Household Goods Movers Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-39) (Y: 100 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-39) |
2019-04-04 | House | Special Order until 04/05 (Delegate Saab) Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Rules and Regulations