MD SB712 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified health insurance carriers from rejecting an application of a medical laboratory for participation on a carrier's provider panel or terminating participation by a medical laboratory on a carrier's provider panel under a specified provision of law if the medical laboratory accepts the terms and conditions established by the carrier for participation by medical laboratories on its provider panel; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Carrier Provider Panels - Medical Laboratories
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2011-03-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0712.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0712f.pdf |