MD SB708 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-09 - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an insurer to exclude a moped and motor scooter from insurance benefits; requiring a moped or motor scooter in the State to be titled and registered by the Motor Vehicle Administration; requiring an owner or prospective owner of a moped or motor scooter to obtain or maintain required security; establishing an annual registration fee and surcharge; prohibiting an individual from operating or riding on a moped or motor scooter unless he or she is wearing protective headgear and specified eye protection; etc.
Title
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Titling, Registration, Insurance, and Required Use
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Astle) {713423/1 Rejected (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Astle) {713423/1 Rejected (Y: 12 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-09 | Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-31 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (34-11) | |
2011-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-29 | Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) Rejected (12-34) | |
2011-03-28 | Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Astle) Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) | |
2011-03-27 | Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Glassman) Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Laid Over (Senator Colburn) Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Mopeds
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Titles
Torts
Trials
Electronic Government
Equipment
Fees
Mopeds
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Titles
Torts
Trials