MD SB706 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a tax credit against the State income tax for contributions made to specified student assistance organizations; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to administer the tax credit; requiring specified entities to submit an application to be a student assistance organization on or before December 1 each year; establishing the Maryland Education Tax Credit Reserve Fund; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (25-19) (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30) (Y: 11 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26) (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26) (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27) (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30) (Y: 11 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29) (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26) (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26) (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27) (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (25-19) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {533822/1 Rejected (16-30) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {273621/1 Rejected (14-31) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Young) {143621/1 Rejected (11-30) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Young) Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {303529/1 Rejected (17-29) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {543321/1 Rejected (19-26) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {523425/1 Rejected (19-26) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kagan) {453921/2 Rejected (17-27) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Discrimination
Examinations
Gifts
Grants
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Discrimination
Examinations
Gifts
Grants
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income