MD SB703 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution relating to the selection and tenure of circuit court judges; requiring Senate confirmation of individuals appointed by the Governor to the office of judge of a circuit court; providing for contested elections following an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of judge of a circuit court under certain circumstances; providing for the reappointment of certain judges; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1402 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Referendum
Retirement
Constitutional Amendments
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Referendum
Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVIII - Provisions of Limited Duration | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |