MD SB700 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person having custody of a will to maintain custody of the will, except under certain circumstances; prohibiting the custodian of a will from taking certain actions related to the will, except under certain circumstances; authorizing the custodian of a will to deposit the will for safekeeping with a certain register of wills under certain circumstances; requiring the custodian of a will to deliver the will to certain persons under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1266 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Attorneys
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Evidence
Forms
Liability
Power of Attorney
Privacy
Records
Registers of Wills
Safety
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Attorneys
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Evidence
Forms
Liability
Power of Attorney
Privacy
Records
Registers of Wills
Safety
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 17 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 4 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 4 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 4 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 4 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 4 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |