MD SB695 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a defendant who has been sentenced to the Division of Correction after being convicted of a specified violent crime is not eligible for commitment for alcohol or drug abuse treatment until the defendant is eligible for parole.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Violent Offenders - Parole as Condition for Alcohol or
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |