MD SB690 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB767

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a custodian of records to deny inspection of the part of a recording from a certain body-worn digital recording device worn by a law enforcement officer regarding certain individuals; requiring certain notification of certain individuals; requiring the Police Training and Standards Commission to develop certain uniform standards and policies; requiring a custodian to deny inspection or copying of a certain recording by an individual who is under investigation or charged with a violation that is the subject of the recording; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-20HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {838774/1 Adopted
2021-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-04SenateHearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB767 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4357(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback