MD SB31 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB690

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 1:00 pm Senate Judicial Proceedings Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing certain requirements for a custodian of records related to certain recordings from a certain body-worn digital recording device worn by a law enforcement officer; and requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop certain uniform standards and policies in consultation with certain groups.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act – Inspection of Records From Body–Worn Digital Recording Devices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-05SenateHearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2021-09-23SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB690 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4101(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4357(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback