MD SB688 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order requiring the cessation of all business operations to certain employers for certain violations of certain wage and hour laws or workplace fraud laws; providing that a certain stop work order takes effect when served and remains in effect until the Commissioner issues an order releasing the stop work order; requiring the Commissioner to issue an order releasing a certain stop work order on a certain showing by the employer; etc.
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1371 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Subjects
Construction
Hearings
Judgments
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Hearings
Judgments
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 2 | 105.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |