MD SB684 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of the Division of Correction to operate a comprehensive rehabilitative prerelease facility for female inmates; requiring that a certain prerelease facility be located in an area, defined by the zip codes where the largest percentage of inmates will likely be released; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to complete certain phases of a certain project by certain dates; requiring the Commissioner to provide evidence-based and gender-responsive prerelease services certain inmates; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-27) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833324/1 (Senator Washington) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) Withdrawn |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {543320/1 (Senator Smith) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568676/1 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB801 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) (31-14) Rejected
Subjects
Certifications
Child Care
Community Colleges
Correction, Division of
Counselors
Education
Health
Housing
Job Training
Legal Aid
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Community Colleges
Correction, Division of
Counselors
Education
Health
Housing
Job Training
Legal Aid
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 3 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |