MD HB801 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) (31-14) Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) (31-14) Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of the Division of Correction to operate a comprehensive rehabilitative prerelease facility for female inmates; requiring that a certain prerelease facility be located in Baltimore City; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to complete certain phases of a certain project by certain dates; requiring the Commissioner to provide evidence-based and gender-responsive prerelease services for female inmates; requiring the Department to provide certain updates to certain committees; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Prerelease Unit for Women - Facilities and Services (Gender-Responsive Prerelease Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) Rejected (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Washington) (31-14) Rejected |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment {368472/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {368472/1 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-31) |
2020-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {872411/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB684 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Certifications
Child Care
Community Colleges
Correction, Division of
Counselors
Education
Health
Housing
Job Training
Legal Aid
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Community Colleges
Correction, Division of
Counselors
Education
Health
Housing
Job Training
Legal Aid
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Substance Abuse
Transportation
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 3 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |