MD SB681 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from recovering specified bedding that is intended to be sold or offered for sale to a consumer in the State unless the person clearly marks the bedding as used; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor and on conviction a person is subject to a maximum fine of $500.
Title
Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {557079/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Labeling
Retail Sales
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Labeling
Retail Sales