MD SB664 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a certain law enforcement unit to sell, exchange, or transfer certain forfeited firearms to a federally licensed firearms dealer under certain circumstances.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {798979/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Allegany County
Carroll County
Dealers
Forfeiture
Frederick County
Garrett County
Guns
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Washington County
Carroll County
Dealers
Forfeiture
Frederick County
Garrett County
Guns
Law Enforcement
Public Safety
Washington County