MD SB664 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a certain law enforcement unit to sell, exchange, or transfer certain forfeited firearms to a federally licensed firearms dealer under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {798979/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback