MD SB656 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to prepare a certain recommendation in connection with certain issues considered by the Public Service Commission; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to incorporate an evaluation of the impact of certain electric power plants on climate change into the Power Plant Research Program; requiring the Commission to consider the maintenance of fair and stable labor standards and the protection of the global climate in supervising and regulating certain public service companies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReferred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation
2020-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2020-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-09SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB531 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment2405(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3303(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2113(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback