MD SB83 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB656

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to prepare a certain recommendation in connection with certain issues considered by the Public Service Commission; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to incorporate an evaluation of the impact of certain electric power plants on climate change into the Power Plant Research Program; requiring the Commission to consider the maintenance of fair and stable labor standards and the protection of the global climate in supervising and regulating certain public service companies; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
2021-04-02SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (93-41)
2021-04-01HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-25HouseReferred Economic Matters
2021-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed (31-14)
2021-02-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-19SenateFloor Amendment {473920/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected
2021-02-17SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2021-02-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted
2021-02-17SenateCommittee Amendment {117073/1 Adopted
2021-02-17SenateFavorable with Amendments
2021-02-16SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
2021-02-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {117073/1
2021-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-10-19SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB298 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
SB656 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment2405(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources3303(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities2113(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback