MD SB653 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB528
Note: Carry Over of previous SB672
Note: Carry Over of previous SB672
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to require certain persons who are convicted of, or granted probation before judgment for, certain criminal offenses related to driving while impaired by alcohol, a drug or drug combination or a combination of drugs and alcohol, to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for certain periods of time.
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB653 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
HB557 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB672 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
HB557 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
SB672 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Substance Abuse
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Substance Abuse
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 16 | 404.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0653?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0653f.pdf |