MD SB652 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Entering into the Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; stating that the goal of the Compact is to improve public access to physical therapy services; requiring a state to meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; requiring a physical therapist to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive certain licensure and exercise a certain privilege; authorizing the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to charge a fee for granting a compact privilege; etc.
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {456682/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994839/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alternative Dispute Resolution
Archives
Armed Forces
Assessments
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Biometrics
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Cybersecurity
Damages
Data
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Equipment
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Expungement
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Mortgages
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Physical Therapists
Prices
Privacy
Real Estate
Real Property
Recordings
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Spouses
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment
Archives
Armed Forces
Assessments
Attorneys
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Biometrics
Civil Actions
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Cybersecurity
Damages
Data
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Equipment
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Expungement
Federal Government
Fees
Fines
Gifts
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Mortgages
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Physical Therapists
Prices
Privacy
Real Estate
Real Property
Recordings
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Spouses
Subpoenas
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment