MD SB649 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of State Documents to make at least the 15 most recent issues of the Maryland Register available to the public for online searching; altering the requirements for a unit of State government to submit certain proposed or emergency regulations, work plans, and evaluation reports to the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review, the Department of Legislative Services, and the Administrator of the Division of State Documents; etc.
Title
State Government - Regulation Procedures and the Maryland Register
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383420/1 Adopted |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {273722/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB817 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Data
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Legislative Services, Department of
Maryland Register
Notices
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Zoning and Planning
Communications
Data
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Legislative Services, Department of
Maryland Register
Notices
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Documents
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 111.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7 | 206.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |