MD SB645 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a member of a State board or commission appointed by the Governor may be a member of a nonprincipal political party; and defining the term "nonprincipal political party".
Title
State Government - State Boards and Commissions - Appointments of Members of Nonprincipal Political Parties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Political Parties
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Governor
Political Parties
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials