MD SB643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, in Garrett County, the days the holder of a manufacturer's license may sell or deliver alcoholic beverages to Monday through Saturday from 6 a.m. to midnight; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue certain deluxe restaurant licenses to holders of certain licenses issued by the Board or other certain licenses issued by other local licensing boards; authorizing the Board to issue a refillable container permit for wine in the county that entitles the holder to sell wine for off-premises consumption; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {644734/1 Adopted |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB786 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Garrett County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Garrett County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |