MD HB786 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, in Garrett County, the days the holder of a manufacturer's license may sell or deliver alcoholic beverages; requiring the Board to charge certain issuing fees in a certain manner; authorizing the Board to issue certain deluxe restaurant licenses to the holders of certain licenses issued by the Board or other certain licenses issued by other local licensing boards; altering the amount of required seating in a restaurant for a Class BDR beer, wine, and liquor license; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {893791/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB643 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Garrett County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Fees
Garrett County
Jurisdiction
License Commissioners, Boards of
Restaurants
Retail Sales
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 2 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 1105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |