MD SB639 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Inclusion Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation as a special, nonlapsing fund to provide capital investment in certain technology-based businesses; requiring the Corporation to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund, and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Inclusion Fund – Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-8) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {817373/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Investments
Minorities
Poverty
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Economic and Community Development
Industry and Technology
Investments
Minorities
Poverty
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 473 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 474 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 475 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |