MD SB636 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date, to beginning October 1, 2021, by which initial and renewal applicants to be appointed as notaries public must complete certain requirements; requiring the Secretary of State, by October 1, 2021, to offer a course of study and an examination that cover the laws, regulations, procedures, and ethics relevant to notarial acts.
Title
Maryland Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts – Requirements for Appointment as a Notary Public – Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 571 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (129-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {216184/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
State Government | 18 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |